NV SB124 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 490.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 490.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions concerning the ownership, possession and control of firearms by certain persons. (BDR 3-307)
Title
Revises provisions concerning the ownership, possession and control of firearms by certain persons. (BDR 3-307)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 490. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 1083 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 9, Excused: 5.) To Senate. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint . |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1083.) To printer. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | To committee. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 567.) |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Secretary's desk. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Secretary's desk. To printer. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 404.) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Prefiled. |