NV SB12 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the City of Reno; replacing gendered language with gender neutral language in certain provisions of the Charter of the City of Reno; authorizing the City Council of the City of Reno to engage in green infrastructure projects; repealing provisions related to the elimination of the office of the Council Member who represents the City at large and the creation of the sixth ward of the City that were to become effective on January 1, 2024; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes to the Charter of the City of Reno. (BDR S-354)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-15 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2022-12-01 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-11-16 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/82nd2023/Bill/9516/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/82nd2023/Bills/SB/SB12.pdf |