NV SB117 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to economic development; requiring the State Plan for Economic Development be updated at least once every 3 years; requiring each regional development authority to present certain information to the Executive Director of the Office of Economic Development at least every 2 years; directing the Legislative Commission to appoint a committee to conduct an interim study concerning existing abatements, tax exemptions and other incentives for economic development in this State; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to economic development. (BDR 18-600)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Taken from General File. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/7430/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/SB/SB117.pdf |