NV SB109 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 352.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 352.
Summary
Deletes the provisions that place each state grazing board within the State Department of Agriculture. (BDR 50-495)
Title
Deletes the provisions that place each state grazing board within the State Department of Agriculture. (BDR 50-495)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-29 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 352. | |
2009-05-23 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-23 | To enrollment. | |
2009-05-23 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-22 | To printer. | |
2009-05-21 | Conference report adopted by Assembly. | |
2009-05-20 | Conference report adopted by Senate. | |
2009-05-20 | From committee: Recede from Assembly Amendment No. 576. | |
2009-05-15 | Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee. | |
2009-05-11 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-08 | Assembly Amendment No. 576 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate. | |
2009-05-08 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-06 | Assembly Amendment No. 576 not concurred in. To Assembly. | |
2009-04-30 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-29 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-29 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-28 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 576.) To printer. | |
2009-04-28 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-04-28 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-27 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-27 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-04-24 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-23 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-22 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-21 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-20 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-17 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-16 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-15 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-14 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-13 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-10 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-09 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-06 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-02 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-01 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-03-31 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-03-30 | Read second time. | |
2009-03-27 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-03-10 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee. | |
2009-03-10 | In Assembly. | |
2009-03-09 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-03-05 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-03-04 | Read second time. | |
2009-03-02 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2009-01-02 | From printer. | |
2008-12-31 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=228 |