NV AB97 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 117.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 117.
Summary
Requires the establishment of procedures for transferring governmental functions between and among local governments and state agencies. (BDR 31-487)
Title
Requires the establishment of procedures for transferring governmental functions between and among local governments and state agencies. (BDR 31-487)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 117. | |
2009-05-15 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Amendment No. 584 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-13 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-12 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-11 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-08 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-06 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-06 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-05 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 584.) To printer. | |
2009-05-04 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2009-04-16 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-15 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-15 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-14 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 124.) To printer. | |
2009-04-14 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-17 | From printer. | |
2008-12-15 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=211 |