NV AB95 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 304.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to water; requiring the State Engineer to continue to allow withdrawals of groundwater from domestic wells under certain circumstances in groundwater basins where withdrawals have been restricted to conform to priority rights; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to water. (BDR 48-504)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 304.
2019-05-28AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly.
2019-05-23SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2019-05-20SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2019-05-16SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-15SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-14SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-13SenateRead second time.
2019-05-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-17SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.
2019-04-17SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 12, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2019-04-16AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-15AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 48.) To printer.
2019-04-11AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
2019-04-11AssemblyTaken from Second Reading File.
2019-04-08AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-04AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2019-01-30AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-01-24AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback