NV AB87 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 279.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 279.
Summary
Revises provisions concerning the collection of debts owed to the State. (BDR 31-494)
Title
Revises provisions concerning the collection of debts owed to the State. (BDR 31-494)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-28 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 279. | |
2009-05-22 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Amendment No. 661 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-20 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-19 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-19 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-18 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 661.) To printer. | |
2009-05-16 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-22 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2009-04-22 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-21 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 4, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-21 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-04-21 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-21 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-21 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-04-21 | Read third time. | |
2009-04-21 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-04-21 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-21 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 511.) Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. To printer. | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-20 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-23 | Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption. | |
2009-03-16 | Notice of exemption. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-17 | From printer. | |
2008-12-15 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=186 |