NV AB80 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 278.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 278.
Summary
Revises provisions relating to excavations. (BDR 40-483)
Title
Revises provisions relating to excavations. (BDR 40-483)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-28 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 278. | |
2009-05-22 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-22 | Senate Amendment No. 835 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-22 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-21 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 835.) To printer. | |
2009-05-19 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-20 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2009-04-20 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-17 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 5.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-17 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-16 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 330.) To printer. | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-16 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-17 | From printer. | |
2008-12-15 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=179 |