NV AB73 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 336.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 336.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to homeless persons; providing for the creation of a temporary working group in Clark County to address issues relating to homelessness; requiring the working group to prepare and submit a report of its recommendations to address issues relating to homelessness; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Provides for the creation of a temporary working group in Clark County to address issues relating to homelessness. (BDR S-461)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Assembly | Chapter 336. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 411.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-11-20 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer. |