NV AB65 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 182.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 182.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; restricting the time of day during which the board of trustees of a school district may take action or corrective action at a regular or special meeting; revising provisions relating to reports regarding and investigations into incidents of discrimination based on race, bullying and cyber-bullying; revising provisions governing the approval of work-based learning programs; revising the requirement for children of a certain age to attend a public school; revising provisions governing the placement of children in certain early grades; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to education. (BDR 34-275)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-02 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 182. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Senate Amendment Nos. 732 and 733 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 5, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 732 and 733.) To printer. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 11.) To Senate. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 138.) To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2022-12-01 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-11-16 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |