NV AB59 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 67.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 67.
Summary
Creates a rebuttable presumption against an award of custody or unsupervised visitation for any person who has abducted a child in the past. (BDR 11-265)
Title
Creates a rebuttable presumption against an award of custody or unsupervised visitation for any person who has abducted a child in the past. (BDR 11-265)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 67. | |
2009-05-05 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-02 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-01 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-30 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-29 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2009-04-16 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-15 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-15 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-14 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 59.) To printer. | |
2009-04-14 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2008-12-11 | From printer. | |
2008-12-09 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=135 |