NV AB54 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 36.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 36.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to traffic safety; creating the Advisory Committee on Traffic Safety within the Department of Transportation; requiring the Advisory Committee to review, study and make recommendations regarding certain issues relating to traffic safety in this State and to prepare an annual report of its activities; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Creates the Advisory Committee on Traffic Safety within the Department of Transportation. (BDR 35-350)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 36. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 4, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2021-04-16 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 55.) To printer. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | To committee. |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-12-22 | Assembly | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |