NV AB538 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to taxation; revising provisions governing the administration of certain taxes; eliminating certain duties of the Department of Taxation relating to the commerce tax and the payroll taxes imposed on certain businesses; maintaining and continuing the existing legally operative rates of the payroll taxes imposed on certain businesses; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing certain taxes. (BDR 32-1199)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Assembly(No further action taken.)
2019-05-27AssemblyPlaced on Chief Clerk's desk.
2019-05-27AssemblyTaken from General File.
2019-05-27AssemblyAction of passage rescinded.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 12, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.)
2019-05-24AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2019-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-05-22AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-05-21AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback