NV AB518 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 396.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 396.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various changes regarding state financial administration and makes appropriations for the support of the civil government of the State. (BDR S-1185)
Title
Makes various changes regarding state financial administration and makes appropriations for the support of the civil government of the State. (BDR S-1185)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 396. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 25, Nays: 14, Excused: 3.) To Senate. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |