NV AB494 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 310.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 310.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state financial administration; making appropriations from the State General Fund and the State Highway Fund for the support of the civil government of the State of Nevada for the 2021-2023 biennium; providing for the use of the money so appropriated; making various other changes relating to the financial administration of the State; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes regarding state financial administration and makes appropriations for the support of the civil government of the State. (BDR S-1170)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 310. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 6, Excused: 3.) To Senate. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |