NV AB494 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 473.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 473.
Summary
Requires certain local governmental entities to submit a report to the 76th Session of the Legislature concerning the consolidation or reorganization of certain functions. (BDR S-1162)
Title
Requires certain local governmental entities to submit a report to the 76th Session of the Legislature concerning the consolidation or reorganization of certain functions. (BDR S-1162)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-08 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 473. | |
2009-06-01 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-30 | Senate Amendment No. 982 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-30 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-30 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-30 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-30 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-05-30 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 982.) To printer. | |
2009-05-30 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-30 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-05-15 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. | |
2009-05-15 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-12 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-08 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-06 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-05-06 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-03-24 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=953 |