NV AB492 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to industrial insurance; revising the circumstances in which a first responder or an employee of the State or a local government is authorized to receive compensation under industrial insurance for certain stress-related claims; requiring an agency which employs a first responder or a volunteer first responder to provide certain educational training concerning mental health issues to the first responder; exempting a claim for certain stress-related injuries suffered by a first responder or an employee of the State or any of its agencies or political subdivisions from certain prohibitions on compensation for an injury and temporary disability; requiring the Administrator of the Division of Industrial Relations of the Department of Business and Industry to include concurrent wages of an injured employee in the calculation of average monthly wage under certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing industrial insurance benefits. (BDR 53-709)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Assembly | Chapter 312. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Senate Amendment Nos. 704 and 896 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 896.) To printer. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 704.) To printer. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 5, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 498.) To printer. |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |