NV AB492 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 487.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 487.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to transferable tax credits to attract film and other productions to Nevada. (BDR 32-1166)
Title
Revises provisions relating to transferable tax credits to attract film and other productions to Nevada. (BDR 32-1166)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 487. |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 8, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |