NV AB476 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 141.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 141.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Department of Motor Vehicles; renaming the Division of Management Services and Programs of the Department of Motor Vehicles as the Division of Research and Project Management; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Renames the Division of Management Services and Programs of the Department of Motor Vehicles. (BDR 43-1149)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Chapter 141. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 6.) To Senate. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |