NV AB457 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 365.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 365.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to chiropractic; providing for the performance of dry needling by a chiropractor; revising provisions relating to membership of the Chiropractic Physicians' Board of Nevada; revising provisions governing the application for a license to practice chiropractic; revising the time period in which a qualified applicant for a license to practice chiropractic may practice while waiting to take the Board's examination; revising provisions relating to temporary licenses to practice chiropractic; authorizing the Board to adopt certain regulations concerning the renewal of certain licenses and certificates; revising provisions relating to reinstating a license to practice chiropractic; revising provisions governing disciplinary action by the Board; repealing the definition of gross malpractice; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing chiropractic physicians and chiropractor's assistants. (BDR 54-933)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Assembly | Chapter 365. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Senate Amendment Nos. 661 and 692 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 3, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 692.) To printer. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2019-05-10 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 661.) To printer. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 491.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |