NV AB435 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 139.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 139.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation; expanding the exemption from the commerce tax for persons who take part in certain events for a purpose related to the conduct of a business; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing the commerce tax. (BDR 32-1049)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Chapter 139. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-02 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-29 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer. |