NV AB435 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 186.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 186.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates October 16 as Sarah Winnemucca Day in Nevada. (BDR 19-1141)
Title
Designates October 16 as Sarah Winnemucca Day in Nevada. (BDR 19-1141)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 186. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-04-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2017-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |