NV AB412 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 373.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 373.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; revising provisions governing fully autonomous vehicles; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing motor vehicles. (BDR 43-1050)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 373. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 559 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 559.) To printer. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) To Senate. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |