NV AB409 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 136.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 136.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to peace officers; requiring the Peace Officers' Standards and Training Commission to adopt certain regulations concerning the recruitment and selection of peace officers; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the recruitment and selection of peace officers. (BDR 23-1031)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Chapter 136. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 6.) To Senate. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |