NV AB407 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 32.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 32.
Summary
Increases the fee for reinstatement of a driver's license or commercial driver's license. (BDR 43-515)
Title
Increases the fee for reinstatement of a driver's license or commercial driver's license. (BDR 43-515)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 32. | |
2009-05-02 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-01 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-04-29 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-28 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-24 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-22 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-21 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-20 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-14 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To committee. | |
2009-04-14 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-13 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 2, Excused: 2.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-10 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-10 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-10 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-03-18 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=794 |