NV AB399 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to employment; creating the Board of Trustees of the Nevada Employee Savings Trust; prescribing the membership, powers, duties and limitations of the Board; authorizing the Board to create the Nevada Employee Savings Trust Program; prescribing certain required attributes of the Program; creating the Nevada Employee Savings Administrative Fund and specifying the sources and uses of money deposited therein; creating the Nevada Employee Savings Trust and prescribing the manner of its administration; providing for the confidentiality of certain information; providing civil immunity to certain persons and entities in connection with the Program; making certain persons fiduciaries with respect to participants in the Program; prohibiting certain persons from engaging in certain financial transactions in connection with the Program; requiring the preparation and submission of certain annual reports; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the establishment of a retirement savings program for private sector employees. (BDR 31-606)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Assembly(No further action taken.)
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 369 and 538.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2019-04-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-22AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-03-22AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-21AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback