NV AB389 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 161.
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 161.
Summary
Revises provisions governing the protection of personal identifying information. (BDR 52-772)
Title
Revises provisions governing the protection of personal identifying information. (BDR 52-772)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 161. | |
2009-05-18 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-16 | Senate Amendment No. 603 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-13 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-12 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-11 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-08 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-06 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-06 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-05 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 603.) To printer. | |
2009-05-04 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-15 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2009-04-15 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-14 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-14 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-13 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 147.) To printer. | |
2009-04-13 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-18 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=772 |