NV AB387 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - In Assembly. To enrollment.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to mental health; establishing a task force to develop a program to prevent the relinquishment of custody of certain children to an agency which provides child welfare services or the voluntary placement of such children with a public or private agency or institution because of a need for services for a mental illness or emotional disturbance; requiring an agency which provides child welfare services to report certain information concerning the relinquishment of custody of children to the agency and the voluntary placement of children with the agency; requiring the Department to report to the Legislature certain information concerning such relinquishment and placement and the effectiveness of the program; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a program to provide services to families of certain children with a mental illness or emotional disturbance. (BDR 39-1000)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-20SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-16SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-15SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-14SenateRead second time.
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 428.) To printer.
2019-04-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-22AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-21AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback