NV AB380 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 485.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 485.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to real property. (BDR 10-340)
Title
Revises provisions relating to real property. (BDR 10-340)
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Yeager [D] | Sen. Nicole Cannizzaro [D] | Sen. Moises Denis [D] | Sen. Aaron Ford [D] |
Sen. Don Gustavson [R] | Sen. Becky Harris [R] | Sen. Michael Roberson [R] | Sen. Richard Segerblom [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 485. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-03 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 875 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 875.) To printer. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 12.) To Senate. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 584.) To printer. |
2017-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |