NV AB363 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 388.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 388.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to transient lodging; requiring the governing bodies of certain counties and cities to establish certain requirements relating to the rental of residential units as transient lodging; requiring certain persons to obtain an authorization for the rental of a residential unit as transient lodging; setting forth various requirements to obtain such an authorization; requiring certain accommodations facilitators to collect and remit taxes on the rental of residential units as transient lodging; revising provisions relating to the authority of a county or city to require a hosting platform to provide certain reports and information to the county or city; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing transient lodging. (BDR 20-636)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 388. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 847 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | To printer. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 847.) |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Action of referral rescinded. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | To printer. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 11, Excused: 1.) |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 789.) |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-09 | Assembly | Waiver granted effective: April 8, 2021. |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Revenue. To committee. |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |