NV AB346 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to facilities; removing the prohibition on persons convicted of certain offenses relating to the use or possession of marijuana from requesting or engaging in certain activities relating to health care or the care of children; removing the prohibition on persons convicted of such crimes from operating or working in an intermediary service organization; authorizing an independent contractor who meets certain requirements to have unsupervised contact with a child at a child care facility; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing health care facilities and child care facilities. (BDR 40-846)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.) |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 419.) To printer. |
2019-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |