NV AB340 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to administrative regulations; directing the Legislative Commission to appoint a committee to conduct an interim study related to the economic impact of administrative regulations; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Directs the Legislative Commission to appoint a committee to conduct an interim study related to the economic impact of administrative regulations. (BDR S-929)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 361.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-19 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |