NV AB325 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Waiver granted effective: April 12, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; revising provisions relating to pretrial release; revising provisions relating to conditions of bail; making various other changes relating to bail; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to bail. (BDR 14-118)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15AssemblyWaiver granted effective: April 12, 2019.
2019-03-20AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback