NV AB325 | 2009 | 75th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 300.

Summary

Revises provisions relating to sex offenders. (BDR 14-1028)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to sex offenders. (BDR 14-1028)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-28 Approved by the Governor. Chapter 300.
2009-05-22 Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
2009-05-21 Senate Amendment No. 692 concurred in. To enrollment.
2009-05-20 In Assembly.
2009-05-19 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2009-05-19 From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2009-05-18 Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 692.) To printer.
2009-05-16 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2009-04-21 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2009-04-21 In Senate.
2009-04-21 To Senate.
2009-04-21 From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2009-04-20 To printer.
2009-04-20 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
2009-04-20 Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2009-04-20 Dispensed with reprinting.
2009-04-20 Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 364.)
2009-04-20 Placed on Second Reading File.
2009-04-20 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2009-03-16 From printer. To committee.
2009-03-13 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback