NV AB309 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to unemployment compensation; requiring the Legislative Auditor to conduct an audit during the 2021-2022 interim of the Employment Security Division of the Department of Employment, Training and Rehabilitation relating to its controls and processes; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the unemployment compensation system. (BDR S-691)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Notice of exemption. |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/7814/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/AB/AB309.pdf |