NV AB296 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to governmental administration; creating the Nevada Office of the Inspector General; setting forth the powers and duties of the Inspector General and employees of the Office; requiring a state agency or local government to cooperate with and provide assistance to the Inspector General in carrying out those duties; prohibiting certain acts to deter or prevent the Inspector General or the employees of the Office from performing his or her duties; prohibiting retaliation against certain persons who make a lawful complaint concerning fraud, waste, abuse or corruption in a state agency or local government; imposing increased penalties for certain acts of assault or battery of the Inspector General or an employee of the Office; making appropriations; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to governmental administration. (BDR 31-557)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6547/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/AB/AB296.pdf |