NV AB288 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-16 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-16 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to residential mortgage loans. (BDR 9-896)
Title
Revises provisions relating to residential mortgage loans. (BDR 9-896)
Sponsors
Rep. Brent Jones [R] | Rep. Jill Dickman [R] | Sen. Edgar Flores [D] | Rep. David Gardner [R] |
Rep. Glenn Trowbridge [R] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-16 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 240.) To printer. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |