NV AB288 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-11 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 506.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-11 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 506.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing graduation from high school. (BDR 34-524)
Title
Revises provisions governing graduation from high school. (BDR 34-524)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-11 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 506. |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | Senate Amendment Nos. 671 and 949 concurred in. |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2013-06-02 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-06-02 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint . |
2013-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 949.) To printer. |
2013-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 671.) To printer. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 267.) To printer. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2013-03-18 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-15 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |