NV AB288 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-16 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-16 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Commission on Economic Development to approve partial abatements of the taxes imposed on certain businesses that locate in this State. (BDR 32-175)
Title
Authorizes the Commission on Economic Development to approve partial abatements of the taxes imposed on certain businesses that locate in this State. (BDR 32-175)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-16 | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) | |
2011-03-23 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2011-03-17 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/76th2011/Reports/history.cfm?ID=605 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/76th2011/Bills/AB/AB288.pdf |