NV AB276 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Chapter 19. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Chapter 19. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to health care; authorizing the use of telehealth for certain communication between providers of health care; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing telehealth. (BDR 54-831)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | Assembly | Chapter 19. (Effective July 1, 2023) |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2023-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-03-10 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |