NV AB247 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-18 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the care of children; authorizing the parent or guardian of a child to execute a power of attorney delegating to another person certain powers relating to the child; prohibiting a provider of foster care from providing overnight or regular and continuous care and supervision to a child who is the subject of such a power of attorney under certain circumstances; authorizing an agency which provides child welfare services to provide a referral to or information concerning certain community-based organizations to the parent or guardian of a child who is alleged to be a child in need of protection; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes relating to the care of children. (BDR 38-289)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-18Senate(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 415.) To printer.
2019-04-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-13AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-12AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback