NV AB232 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to legislative affairs; creating the Legislative Committee on the Reduction of Nonessential State Expenditures; prescribing the powers and duties of the Committee; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Creates the Legislative Committee on the Reduction of Nonessential State Expenditures. (BDR 17-593)
Sponsors
Rep. Annie Black [R] | Rep. Andy Matthews [R] | Rep. Jill Dickman [R] | Rep. Jim Wheeler [R] |
Rep. John Ellison [R] | Rep. Richard McArthur [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Exempt pursuant to subsection 4 of Joint Standing Rule 14.6. |
2021-03-19 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-12 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/7678/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/AB/AB232.pdf |