CA AB2412 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 10.8 (commencing with Section 4660) to Division 2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to body contouring.
Title
Healing arts: California Body Contouring Council: practitioners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4660 | New Code | See Bill Text |