AZ SB1295 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-04 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-04 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Advanced practice registered nurses; compact
Title
Advanced practice registered nurses; compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-04 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Motion Senator Marsh moved that the Senate request the return of Senate Bill 1295 from the House. Motion failed. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Motion Senator Marsh moved that the Senate request the return of Senate Bill 1295 from the House. Motion failed. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Motion Senator Marsh moved that the Senate request the return of Senate Bill 1295 from the House. Motion failed. (Y: 10 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Motion Senator Marsh moved that the Senate request the return of Senate Bill 1295 from the House. Motion failed (Y: 10 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-04 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Motion Senator Marsh moved that the Senate request the return of Senate Bill 1295 from the House. Motion failed. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Motion Senator Marsh moved that the Senate request the return of Senate Bill 1295 from the House. Motion failed. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Motion Senator Marsh moved that the Senate request the return of Senate Bill 1295 from the House. Motion failed. (Y: 10 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Motion Senator Marsh moved that the Senate request the return of Senate Bill 1295 from the House. Motion failed (Y: 10 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-25 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-03-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-18 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-1-0-0-0) |
2024-02-27 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senator Marsh moved that the Senate request the return of Senate Bill 1295 from the House. Motion failed. |
2024-02-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-11-2-0) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact (h)
Advanced Practice Registered Nurses
Amendment
Applicability
Applications For Licensure
Arizona State Board Of Nursing
Compact
Coordinated Licensure Information System
Definitions
Effective Date
Enforcement
General Provisions
Health Professional Licensure Compacts (h)
Health Professionals (h)
Interstate Commission
Notification
Oversight
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Purpose
Rulemaking
Scope Of Practice
Social Work Licensure Compact (h)
Advanced Practice Registered Nurses
Amendment
Applicability
Applications For Licensure
Arizona State Board Of Nursing
Compact
Coordinated Licensure Information System
Definitions
Effective Date
Enforcement
General Provisions
Health Professional Licensure Compacts (h)
Health Professionals (h)
Interstate Commission
Notification
Oversight
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Purpose
Rulemaking
Scope Of Practice
Social Work Licensure Compact (h)