NV AB23 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Chapter 72.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Chapter 72.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; revising the procedure for the commitment of certain criminal defendants whom the court finds to be incompetent to the custody of the Administrator of the Division of Public and Behavioral Health of the Department of Health and Human Services; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions regarding the procedure to commit an incompetent criminal defendant. (BDR 14-291)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Chapter 72. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 72.) To printer. |
2021-04-09 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2021-04-09 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | To committee. |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-12-22 | Assembly | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |