NV AB228 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 127.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Chapter 127.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to child welfare; prescribing the requirements governing the credentialing and operation of children's advocacy centers; providing that certain persons are immune from civil liability for certain actions or omissions in duties performed on behalf of or through a children's advocacy center; requiring the governing body of each county and each agency which provides child welfare services to ensure access to a children's advocacy center for certain children; creating an account to support children's advocacy centers; authorizing the disclosure of certain information to a multidisciplinary team of a children's advocacy center; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Establishes provisions relating to children's advocacy centers. (BDR 38-358)
Sponsors
Rep. Brittney Miller [D] | Rep. Michelle Gorelow [D] | Rep. Daniele Monroe-Moreno [D] | Rep. Clara Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Chapter 127. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 67.) To printer. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |