NV AB224 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 457.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 457.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the collection and maintenance of certain data relating to public education. (BDR 34-269)
Title
Revises provisions governing the collection and maintenance of certain data relating to public education. (BDR 34-269)
Sponsors
Rep. Elliot Anderson [D] | Rep. Irene Bustamante Adams [D] | Sen. Marilyn Dondero Loop [D] | Sen. Joyce Woodhouse [D] |
Sen. Patricia Spearman [D] | Sen. David Parks [D] | Sen. Kelvin Atkinson [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 457. |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2013-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2013-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Action of referral rescinded. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | To committee. |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | Exemption effective. |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 112.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2013-04-03 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2013-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-03-11 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-08 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |