NV AB218 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 434.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 434.
Summary
Makes various changes relating to gaming. (BDR 41-603)
Title
Makes various changes relating to gaming. (BDR 41-603)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-03 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 434. | |
2009-06-01 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-29 | To enrollment. | |
2009-05-29 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-29 | To printer. | |
2009-05-29 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | To Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendment Nos. 931 and 933 receded from. | |
2009-05-28 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Amendment Nos. 931 and 933 not concurred in. To Senate. | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Amendment No. 918 concurred in. | |
2009-05-23 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-23 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Assembly. | |
2009-05-22 | To printer. | |
2009-05-22 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 2, Excused: 1, Not voting: 1.) | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-22 | Reprinting dispensed with. | |
2009-05-22 | Amended. (Amend. Nos. 918, 933 and 931.) | |
2009-05-22 | Read third time. | |
2009-05-22 | Action of adoption of amendment rescinded. | |
2009-05-22 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 913.) | |
2009-05-22 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-22 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-22 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2009-04-22 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-21 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 10, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-21 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-04-21 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-17 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-17 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-04-16 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-04-16 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-01 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-03-31 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-03-30 | Read second time. | |
2009-03-27 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-03-02 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-02-27 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=446 |