NV AB215 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the collection and application of graywater for a single-family residence. (BDR 40-3)
Title
Provides for the collection and application of graywater for a single-family residence. (BDR 40-3)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 892.) To printer. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | To committee. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | Exemption effective. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 385.) To printer. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-04-03 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2013-03-08 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |