NV AB186 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
Pending: Senate Government Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to peace officers; prohibiting a law enforcement agency from requiring a peace officer to issue a certain number of traffic citations or make a certain number of arrests; prohibiting a law enforcement agency from considering the number of citations issued or arrests made by a peace officer, or the amount of fines or fees assessed from the citations or arrests, in evaluating the performance of the peace officer; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes provisions relating to the issuance of citations and arrests by peace officers. (BDR 23-634)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2021-04-16SenateIn Senate.
2021-04-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate.
2021-04-15AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2021-04-14AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 254.) To printer.
2021-04-13AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
2021-04-13AssemblyTaken from Second Reading File.
2021-04-13AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-04-13AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-03-05AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2021-03-04AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback